|
|||||||||||
|
|||||||||||
12 Jun 2001, 12:11 (Ref:104380) | #51 | ||
Veteran
Join Date: Mar 2001
Posts: 2,221
|
I think it was from the names of the makers. You need to find the Sports Car World article on the car. GS Motor Bodies built them, but i doubt that anyone there today would know... but it might be worth a try.
|
||
|
12 Jun 2001, 13:34 (Ref:104421) | #52 | ||
Rookie
Join Date: Jun 2001
Posts: 15
|
Canstel Clubman
Re CANSTEL CLUBMAN
They were built by Specialised Fibreglass Mouldings at Taren Point. The owner was Graham Steele. The "STEL" part came from his name. Perhaps "Canstel" just had a good sound. Regards Brian Lear |
||
|
12 Jun 2001, 13:43 (Ref:104423) | #53 | ||
Veteran
Join Date: Mar 2001
Posts: 2,221
|
Brian, two posts... this is getting extravagant!
And both in the one thread... GS Motor Bodies had the moulds later on, I'm sure. I recall something about Steve Wiessner and Terry O'Neil and Steve's wife's car... did SFM sell out to GS Motor Bodies? And don't be shy mate, post a few in some of the other threads... |
||
|
12 Jun 2001, 21:00 (Ref:104509) | #54 | ||
Rookie
Join Date: Apr 2001
Posts: 6
|
MARCH
Sorry, Iv'e just come in on the naming game.
During the run up to the launch of MARCH, a well known magazine suggested that it stood for Much Advertized Racing Car Hoax ! An obvious one was Morris Garages, or MG. |
||
|
13 Jun 2001, 12:54 (Ref:104763) | #55 | ||
Rookie
Join Date: Jun 2001
Posts: 15
|
Canstel Clubman
Ray,
Not sure whether Specialised Fiberglass Mouldings sold the moulds to GS, BUT I certainly wouldnt argue with your memory. My info came from my trusty old RCN's of 1969. Regards Brian Lear |
||
|
13 Jun 2001, 13:07 (Ref:104769) | #56 | ||
Veteran
Join Date: Mar 2001
Posts: 2,221
|
Thanks Brian. Now, what other threads are you going to post in so that you can get away from that 'rookie' title?
Maybe you can start a thread about hillclimbing old Coopers? And there's scope for lots of things in the Road Car Forum. |
||
|
2 Jul 2001, 14:12 (Ref:112109) | #57 | |
Rookie
Join Date: Jul 2001
Posts: 10
|
In the posts so far I didn't see Arrows mentioned. I've read two versions of what ARROWS stand for. Some sources claim it is Ambrosio Racing (the sponsor) Rees Oliver Wass Southgate, but I've also seen the version that it stands for Alan Rees Rees (Debbie in this case) Oliver Wass Southgate.
Does anybody know what the right version is? |
|
|
2 Jul 2001, 19:24 (Ref:112209) | #58 | ||
Racer
Join Date: May 2001
Posts: 189
|
Franco Ambrosio was involved in the founding, but was jailed soon after. The team always prefered Alan Rees Rees Oliver Wass Southgate, though.
|
||
|
2 Jul 2001, 19:27 (Ref:112211) | #59 | ||
Racer
Join Date: May 2001
Posts: 189
|
A nice afterthought on Arrows: when Southgate left and was to be replaced by Gustav Brunner, someone proposed to replace the "s" at the end with a "b" at the beginning, making the car a Barrow...
|
||
|
4 Jul 2001, 12:29 (Ref:112920) | #60 | ||
Racer
Join Date: Mar 2000
Posts: 246
|
I think the info on Fodens is incorrect. There were 2 Foden brothers who made steam engined trucks originally. When petrol engines started becoming more popular, oneof the brothers wanted to build petrol trucks. They disagreed & so split, with E(dmund?) R Foden setting up his own company across the road from the original Foden company, (still in business), in Cheshire, England. Both companies still exist, (as part of larger groups). Can't remember which, but one of them only makes trucks to order these days.
|
||
|
4 Jul 2001, 13:40 (Ref:112960) | #61 | ||
Veteran
Join Date: Mar 2001
Posts: 2,221
|
SNH - I understood it was Eric, with the second name possibly Royce. It's a very long time since I read about it, so don't know if my memory is at fault or the article I read it in.
|
||
|
8 Jan 2007, 03:10 (Ref:1809252) | #62 | ||||
Rookie
Join Date: Jun 2003
Posts: 44
|
Quote:
"That's a Different Gearbox". Quote:
|
||||
|
14 Jan 2007, 23:00 (Ref:1815293) | #63 | ||
Rookie
Join Date: Oct 2006
Posts: 23
|
I list the french mark who start in the 24 Hours of LE MANS
A.L.D. : Automobiles Louis Descartes ALPHI : Automobiles du Luart, Poniatowski, Hongardy, Ingénieurs ALPINE : in the memory of one of the first victory for Jean REDELE B.N.C. : Bollack Netter et Cie C.D : Charles Deutsch D.B. : Deutsch et Bonnet E.H.P. : Etablissements Henri Précloux D.F.P. : Doriot Flandrin Parant F.A.S.T.O. : Fabrication Automobiles ST Ouen G.M. : Gendron et Michelot M.A.P. : Manufactures d'Armed de Paris S.A.R.A. : Société d'Application du Refroidissement par Air S.C.A.P. : Société de Construction Automobiles de Paris STHEMO : STriebig HEuclin MÖssinger V.P. : Vernet Pairard W.M : Welter et Meunier W.R. : Welter Racing and For LIGIER team JS letters from the memory of Jo Schlesser friend of Guy Ligier. Last edited by Haine Kane; 14 Jan 2007 at 23:02. |
||
__________________
I'm born 40 years day for day after the birth of the 24 hours of LE MANS |
17 Jan 2007, 17:46 (Ref:1817765) | #64 | ||
Racer
Join Date: Sep 2006
Posts: 402
|
Quote:
|
||
|
17 Jan 2007, 21:26 (Ref:1817922) | #65 | |||
Veteran
Join Date: Apr 2004
Posts: 3,820
|
Quote:
|
|||
__________________
a salary slave no more... |
14 May 2007, 19:26 (Ref:1913451) | #66 | |||
Rookie
Join Date: May 2007
Posts: 2
|
Quote:
The Mini Marcos came along in 1965, after Jem Marsh cancelled Dizzy Addicott's DART project. The latter was taken over by Jem Delmar-Morgan who launched it a year later as the Mini Jem. Mike Costin was Frank's brother and was the "COS" in Cosworth (with Keith Duckworth). |
|||
|
15 May 2007, 02:34 (Ref:1913598) | #67 | |||
Veteran
Join Date: May 2004
Posts: 2,540
|
Quote:
|
|||
|
20 Jul 2007, 00:36 (Ref:1967927) | #68 | ||
Veteran
Join Date: Apr 2003
Posts: 2,437
|
SARD - Sigma Auto Racing Department
|
||
__________________
Nulla Tenaci Invia Est Via |
20 Jul 2007, 05:01 (Ref:1968008) | #69 | ||
Veteran
Join Date: Sep 2006
Posts: 12,853
|
MG?
|
||
__________________
Living the dream,Chief instruktor and racing on the worlds best circuits-The Nordschleife and Spa.Getting to drive the worlds best cars-someone has to do it, so glad its me. |
21 Jul 2007, 19:27 (Ref:1969356) | #70 | |||
Veteran
Join Date: Mar 2003
Posts: 585
|
Quote:
|
|||
__________________
Duncan Rollo The more you learn, the more you realise how little you know. |
21 Jul 2007, 19:56 (Ref:1969380) | #71 | ||
Racer
Join Date: Oct 2004
Posts: 126
|
hi there
REO Speedwagon was a 1930's bus what about the manufacturers who got it wrong? Edsel Nissan Cedric Toyota Picnic Suzuki Cappuchino Leyland Titanic(yes its a real one) any more? db |
||
__________________
SD1's & CAPRI's ARE FOR LIFE NOT JUST FOR CHRISTMAS |
25 Jul 2007, 08:11 (Ref:1972799) | #72 | ||
Rookie
Join Date: Aug 2006
Posts: 41
|
Quote:
|
||
|
25 Jul 2007, 20:30 (Ref:1973393) | #73 | |||
Veteran
Join Date: Mar 2003
Posts: 585
|
Quote:
Oh Borrocks! |
|||
__________________
Duncan Rollo The more you learn, the more you realise how little you know. |
26 Jul 2007, 15:59 (Ref:1974127) | #74 | |
Rookie
Join Date: Apr 2006
Posts: 10
|
When you hear SEAT the first you thing is about a four-wheels engineered chair, but it really means:
Sociedad Española de Técnicos de la Automoción Translation: Spanish society of automotive technicians. Regards |
|
|
23 Aug 2007, 16:15 (Ref:1995203) | #75 | |
Rookie
Join Date: Aug 2007
Posts: 29
|
None of the Historic F3 owners seem to have mentioned Mr JA Prestwich - the founder of JAP.
Some Vincents had their crankcases marked HRD for Howard Robert Davies (or was it Davis). and one of my favourites is DOT motorcycles which stood for Devoid of Trouble. If you look closely at the DOT tank badge it is written around the edge. Then there is CCM Clews Competition Motorcycles founded by Alan Clews. I believe Rochdale Motor Panels got their name simply because they were based in Rochdale. I have an idea that Gilbern and Ginetta are based on amalgamations of parts of the founders names but I don't know the story behind those two. |
|
|